Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Adophe Lenfant

Deceased

Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1858BornParis
16 Apr 188123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
1 Jun 191557.4AppointedBishop of Digne, France
8 Sep 191557.7Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
6 Aug 191759.6DiedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

MicroData Summary for Léon-Adophe Lenfant:
Bishop Léon-Adophe Lenfant (born , died ) Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013