Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Raynaud

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

Titular Bishop of Germa in Galatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1858Born
1881²22.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
5 Jul 191657.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
5 Jul 191657.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
28 Oct 191658.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
1935²76.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
25 Nov 193779.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Raynaud
Bishop Jean Raynaud (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillenouvelle

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017