Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie Ricard

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1868Born
11 Jun 189223.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 192354.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nice, France
26 Oct 192354.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
15 Dec 192355.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
31 Mar 192657.3AppointedBishop of Nice, France
22 Jun 192657.5InstalledBishop of Nice, France
21 Oct 192960.9DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Ricard
Bishop Louis-Marie Ricard (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBondigoux

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017