Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Marceillac

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1863BornGrenade
26 May 188824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
19 Aug 191653.1AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
28 Oct 191653.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
21 Dec 191653.4InstalledBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
10 Jun 194783.9DiedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marceillac:
Bishop Pierre Marceillac (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932, Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013