Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Castel

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1868BornFoix
5 Jul 189123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
3 Aug 191850.1AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
9 Oct 191850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
8 Oct 193971.3DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Castel:
Bishop Jean Castel (born , died ) Bishop of Tulle

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015