Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Louis Auvity, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mende

Titular Bishop of Dionysiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1874BornGermigny-l'Exempt
27 May 189925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
2 Jun 193359.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bourges, France
2 Jun 193359.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
6 Jul 193359.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
14 Aug 193763.6AppointedBishop of Mende, France
11 Sep 194571.7ResignedBishop of Mende, France
11 Sep 194571.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
15 Feb 196490.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for François-Louis Auvity:
Bishop François-Louis Auvity P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mende

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013