Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph-Léonce Villepelet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1892BornSaint-Amand-Montrond
29 Jun 191623.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 193643.9AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
13 Oct 193644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
2 Jul 196673.8RetiredBishop of Nantes, France
2 Jul 196673.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rucuma
10 Dec 197078.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Rucuma
23 Jan 198289.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Léonce Villepelet:
Bishop Jean-Joseph-Léonce Villepelet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nantes

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013