Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Marcel Cardinal Honoré

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tours

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1920BornSaint-Brice-en-Coglès
29 Jun 194322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
24 Oct 197252.2AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
17 Dec 197252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
13 Aug 198161.0AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
22 Jul 199776.9RetiredArchbishop of Tours, France
21 Feb 200180.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200180.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle
28 Feb 201392.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Marcel Honoré:
Cardinal Jean Marcel Honoré (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tours

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013