Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Jean Joseph Jules Perrier

Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1936 BornParis
7 Mar 196427.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 199053.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chartres, France
16 Sep 199053.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Chartres, France
6 Apr 199154.3SucceededBishop of Chartres, France
30 May 199760.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
16 Jan 199861.1SucceededBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
11 Feb 201275.2RetiredBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Jean Joseph Jules Perrier:
Bishop Jacques Jean Joseph Jules Perrier (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,078
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013