Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Jean Lucien Marie Percerou

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 196163.65 Born
7 Dec 199130.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chartres, France
14 Jun 199230.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chartres, France
14 Feb 201351.4AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
14 Apr 201351.5Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
11 Aug 202058.9AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
20 Sep 202059.0InstalledBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Jean Lucien Marie Percerou
(VIAF: 300825049; WikiData: Q4669000)
Bishop Laurent Jean Lucien Marie Percerou (born ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDreux, Diocese of Chartres
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame, Church, Châteauneuf-en-Thymerais, Diocese of Chartres
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral Basilica, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres
Ordained BishopCathedral, Moulins, Diocese of Moulins

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nantes.

  • a priest for 32.89 years
  • a bishop for 12.06 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,764
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Aug 2020
  • i: CB, 11 Aug 2020
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 12 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024