Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Armand Alexis Jean Pansard

Bishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1955 Born
19 Jun 198226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nanterre, France
21 Dec 200550.4AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
5 Feb 200650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
1 Aug 201762.0AppointedBishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
1 Oct 201762.2InstalledBishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Armand Alexis Jean Pansard (VIAF: 302009256)
Bishop Michel Armand Alexis Jean Pansard (born ) Bishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,055
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018