Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Léon-Jean Chevalier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1896BornMarolles-les-Braults
10 Jun 192225.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 195154.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Le Mans, France
21 Aug 195154.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhandus
11 Oct 195155.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhandus
30 Aug 195761.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Le Mans, France
4 May 195962.6SucceededBishop of Le Mans, France
28 Oct 197175.1RetiredBishop of Le Mans, France
4 Mar 197679.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Léon-Jean Chevalier:
Bishop Paul-Léon-Jean Chevalier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015