Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard-Pierre-Edmond Alix

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1909Born
12 Mar 193222.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 196555.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Le Mans, France
19 May 196555.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mediana
5 Jul 196555.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mediana
12 Jul 196757.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Le Mans, France
28 Oct 197162.1SucceededBishop of Le Mans, France
13 Aug 198171.9ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
4 May 198878.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard-Pierre-Edmond Alix
Bishop Bernard-Pierre-Edmond Alix (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorient

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018