Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Julien-André Gouet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Augurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1910BornFillé-sur-Sarthe
17 Dec 193727.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 196656.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
30 Dec 196656.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
27 Feb 196756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus
30 Nov 198272.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
15 Dec 198878.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Julien-André Gouet:
Bishop Victor-Julien-André Gouet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015