Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel-Joseph-Louis-Marie Pézeril

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Reperi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1911BornLa Serena
27 Mar 193725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
30 Sep 196756.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
30 Sep 196756.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Reperi
6 Jan 196856.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Reperi
5 Oct 198675.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
23 Apr 199886.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Daniel-Joseph-Louis-Marie Pézeril:
Bishop Daniel-Joseph-Louis-Marie Pézeril (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013