Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfred-Henri-Marie Cardinal Baudrillart, C.O. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme

Titular See: (Rector/Institut Catholique de Paris)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1859BornParis
9 Jul 189334.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
29 Jul 192162.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
29 Jul 192162.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
28 Oct 192162.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
12 Apr 192869.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
16 Dec 193576.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 193577.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
19 May 194283.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Henri-Marie Baudrillart:
Cardinal Alfred-Henri-Marie Baudrillart C.O. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 75
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013