Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest-Victor Mennechet

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1877BornMarle
29 Jun 190124.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 192850.7AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
1 May 192850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
2 Jun 194669.0DiedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

MicroData Summary for Ernest-Victor Mennechet:
Bishop Ernest-Victor Mennechet (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1928, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013