Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Neveux

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Reims

Titular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1859BornLa Grandville
22 Sep 188324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Reims, France
16 Jul 191455.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
16 Jul 191455.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
29 Jun 191556.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
7 Sep 193879.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Ernest Neveux:
Bishop Ernest Neveux (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Reims

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 36
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013