Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Marie Tissier

Deceased

Bishop of Châlons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1857Born
18 Dec 188023.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 191255.3AppointedBishop of Châlons, France
24 Feb 191355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
16 May 194789.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Châlons, France
9 Jan 194890.4DiedBishop of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Tissier
Archbishop Joseph-Marie Tissier (born , died ) Bishop of Châlons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ferté-Beauharnais

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast