Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Curien

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1868BornSenones
11 Jun 189224.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 192355.8AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
5 Feb 192456.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
8 Nov 193769.7ResignedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
8 Nov 193769.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
6 Aug 194779.5DiedBishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Eugène Curien:
Bishop Eugène Curien (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013