Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Lagrange

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1827Born
2 Jun 185528.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 188962.7SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
30 Dec 188962.7ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
19 Mar 189063.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
23 Jun 189568.2DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for François Lagrange (VIAF: 33528267)
Bishop François Lagrange (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDun-le-Roi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017