Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Joseph Hurault

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1873BornChâlons-sur-Marne
19 Dec 189623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Châlons, France
20 Dec 192350.1AppointedBishop of Viviers, France
25 Mar 192450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
1 Apr 192450.4InstalledBishop of Viviers, France
23 Dec 193057.2AppointedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
12 Feb 193157.3InstalledBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
7 Apr 193460.4DiedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Joseph Hurault:
Bishop Etienne-Joseph Hurault (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013