Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Jacques Marie Jacquemin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1902Born
3 Apr 192624.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 195149.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
20 Dec 195149.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
25 Mar 195250.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae
29 Oct 195452.7AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
10 Dec 196967.8ResignedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
10 Dec 196967.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elvas
10 Dec 197068.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Elvas
20 Dec 197573.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for André Jacques Marie Jacquemin
Bishop André Jacques Marie Jacquemin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerdun

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018