Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Émile Fonteneau

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1825Born
23 Dec 184823.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 187449.2SelectedBishop of Agen, France
21 Dec 187449.3ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
25 Jan 187549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
16 Feb 187549.5InstalledBishop of Agen, France
22 Sep 188459.1SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
13 Nov 188459.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
18 Dec 188459.3InstalledArchbishop of Albi, France
23 Mar 189973.6DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Émile Fonteneau (VIAF: 12432006)
Archbishop Jean-Émile Fonteneau (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017