Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ange-Marie-Paul Hiral, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Port-Said, Egypt

Titular Bishop of Sululos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1871Born
17 Feb 189422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Mar 192957.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Canale di Suez {Suez Canal}, Egypt
18 Mar 192957.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sululos
19 May 192957.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sululos
18 Jan 195280.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Port-Said, Egypt

MicroData Summary for Ange-Marie-Paul Hiral
Bishop Ange-Marie-Paul Hiral O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Port-Said

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMèze, France

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018