Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said

Apostolicus Vicariatus Portus Saidi

United

To: Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Canale di Suez {Suez Canal}
12 July 1926ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Canale di Suez {Suez Canal} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said
27 January 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Canale di Suez {Suez Canal} Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said
30 November 1987UnitedVicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto
Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said
1970259360,000.1%55517355ap1971
198037544938373ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 28 Nov 2012