Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Delegation to Indochina | |||
20 May 1925 | Established | Delegation to Indochina | |
Delegation to Vietnam and Cambodia | |||
17 June 1964 | Name Changed | Delegation to Indochina | Delegation to Vietnam and Cambodia |
25 March 1994 | Established | Delegation to Vietnam and Cambodia | Nunciature to Cambodia |
Delegation to Vięt Nam | |||
2011 | Established | Delegation to Vięt Nam |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Apr 2023 |
✠