Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marek Zalewski

Apostolic Nuncio to Singapore

Titular Archbishop of Africa

Official to Viêt Nam

Titular See: (Non-residential pontifical representative for Vietnam)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1963 Born
27 May 198926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
25 Mar 201451.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Africa
25 Mar 201451.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe
31 May 201451.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Africa
21 May 201855.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Singapore
21 May 201855.3AppointedOfficial to Viêt Nam

MicroData Summary for Marek Zalewski
Archbishop Marek Zalewski (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Singapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAugustow, Diocese of Łomża, Poland
Ordained PriestSt. Michael the Archangel, Cathedral Basilica, Łomża, Diocese of Łomża, Poland
Ordained BishopSt. Michael the Archangel, Cathedral Basilica, Łomża, Diocese of Łomża, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Singapore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 2 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 16 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,175
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 May 2018

Quantcast