Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janusz Bogusław Stepnowski

Bishop of Łomża, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1958 Born
1 Jun 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
11 Nov 201153.3AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
18 Dec 201153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Janusz Bogusław Stepnowski
Bishop Janusz Bogusław Stepnowski (born ) Bishop of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstrołęka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Łomża.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017