Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romuald Kamiński

Coadjutor Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1955 Born
7 Jun 198126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
25 Mar 199237.1IncardinatedPriest of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
8 Jun 200550.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ełk, Poland
8 Jun 200550.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aguntum
23 Jun 200550.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aguntum
14 Sep 201762.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

MicroData Summary for Romuald Kamiński (VIAF: 166213071)
Bishop Romuald Kamiński (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Warszawa-Praga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJanówka, Diocese of Łomża
Ordained BishopSt-Adalbert, Cathedral, Ełk, Diocese of Ełk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Warszawa-Praga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,900
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 14 Sep 2017