Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacek Grzybowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

Titular Bishop of Nova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1973 Born
30 May 199824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
26 Nov 202047.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
26 Nov 202047.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
19 Dec 202047.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova

MicroData Summary for Jacek Grzybowski
Bishop Jacek Grzybowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWołomin, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Warszawa-Praga, Diocese of Warszawa-Praga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Warszawa-Praga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 27 Nov 2020
  • c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 19 Dec 2020

Quantcast