Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Romaniuk

Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1927 BornHolowienki
16 Dec 195124.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 198254.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
20 Feb 198254.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
4 Mar 198254.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
25 Mar 199264.6AppointedBishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
26 Aug 200477.0RetiredBishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Romaniuk:
Bishop Kazimierz Romaniuk (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Warszawa-Praga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,828
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014