Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Pikus

Bishop Emeritus of Drohiczyn, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1949 Born
7 Jun 198131.7Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
24 Apr 199949.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
24 Apr 199949.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
8 May 199949.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysinia
29 Mar 201464.5AppointedBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland
25 May 201464.7InstalledBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland
17 Jun 201969.7ResignedBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Pikus (VIAF: 102305329)
Bishop Tadeusz Pikus (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Drohiczyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZabiele
Ordained BishopSaint Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Drohiczyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,547
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022