Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Modzelewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Titular Bishop of Daonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1905BornWarszawa
12 Feb 192822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
18 Nov 195853.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
18 Nov 195853.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Daonium
8 Feb 195953.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daonium
27 Oct 198681.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Modzelewski:
Bishop Jerzy Modzelewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Apr 2014