Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygmunt Choromański

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Titular Bishop of Panopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1892BornVarsavia
30 Nov 191624.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 194654.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
7 May 194654.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Panopolis
29 Jun 194654.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panopolis
26 Dec 196876.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Choromański:
Bishop Zygmunt Choromański (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015