Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoni Wladyslaw Szlagowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Archbishop of Cotyaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1864Born
21 Dec 189026.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 192863.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
22 Jun 192863.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
7 Oct 192864.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
24 Nov 194581.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotyaeum
28 Feb 195691.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Wladyslaw Szlagowski
Archbishop Antoni Wladyslaw Szlagowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGulczewo

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast