Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Leon Fulman

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1866Born
13 May 188923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
24 Sep 191852.4AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
17 Nov 191852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lublin, Poland
18 Dec 194579.7DiedBishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Leon Fulman
Bishop Marian Leon Fulman (born , died ) Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStare Miasto

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018