Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislaw Kazimierz Ruszkiewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Archbishop of Nacolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1836Born
4 Jul 185822.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Dec 185822.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188448.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
24 Mar 188448.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
6 Jul 188448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
2 Nov 191781.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nacolia
29 Mar 192589.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Kazimierz Ruszkiewicz (VIAF: 164891145)
Archbishop Stanislaw Kazimierz Ruszkiewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDzięciołówka, Diocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, Pro-Cathderal, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,802
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017