Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Ludwik Pollner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1825Born
9 Jul 184924.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188458.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
24 Mar 188458.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
5 Jul 188560.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
9 Mar 188761.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Karol Ludwik Pollner
Bishop Karol Ludwik Pollner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRawa
Ordained BishopSt. Petersbourg

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1886, Page 330
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017