Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Gall

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Titular Archbishop of Carpathus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1865BornWarszawa
29 Jun 188722.2Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
29 Jul 191853.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
29 Jul 191853.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
17 Nov 191853.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
5 Feb 191953.8AppointedBishop of Poland, Military
15 Feb 193367.8ResignedBishop of Poland, Military
16 Feb 193367.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpathus
6 Jan 194074.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
11 Sep 194277.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Gall:
Archbishop Stanisław Gall (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 54
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013