Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Stanisław Owczarek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1875Born
3 Jul 189822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
29 Jul 191842.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
29 Jul 191842.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
10 Nov 191842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
30 Sep 193862.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Stanisław Owczarek
Bishop Wojciech Stanisław Owczarek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁęg Baliński

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 51
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017