Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolf Józef Jełowicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1863BornWarszawa
7 Dec 189027.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 191855.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
9 Nov 191855.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
23 Mar 191956.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
7 Jul 193774.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adolf Józef Jełowicki:
Bishop Adolf Józef Jełowicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015