Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zdzisław Goliński

Deceased

Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1908Born
28 Jun 193122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
28 Mar 194738.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lublin, Poland
28 Mar 194738.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
3 Aug 194738.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
22 Apr 195142.3AppointedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
17 Jun 195142.4InstalledBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
6 Jul 196354.5DiedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zdzisław Goliński (VIAF: 162440399)
Bishop Zdzisław Goliński (born , died ) Bishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrzędów, Diocese of Lublin
Ordained PriestSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Lublin, Diocese of Lublin
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Lublin, Diocese of Lublin
Death PlaceCzęstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Crypt, Holy Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast