Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Strakowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Girba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1910Born
18 Jun 193323.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 195848.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
3 May 195848.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
29 Jun 195848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba
6 May 196555.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Strakowski
Bishop Henryk Strakowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWola Uchanska

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast