Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waclaw Majewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Docimium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1891Born
30 Nov 191625.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 194654.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
7 May 194654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Docimium
29 Jun 194654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Docimium
14 Jan 198391.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Waclaw Majewski
Bishop Waclaw Majewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarszawa

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018