Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zbigniew Józef Kraszewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga

Titular Bishop of Horreomargum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1922BornWarszawa
12 Mar 194927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
17 Nov 197048.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
17 Nov 197048.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Horreomargum
8 Dec 197048.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horreomargum
25 Mar 199270.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
6 Dec 199775.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
4 Apr 200482.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zbigniew Józef Kraszewski:
Bishop Zbigniew Józef Kraszewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013