Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafał Markowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Obba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1958 Born
6 Jun 198224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
4 Nov 201355.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
4 Nov 201355.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
7 Dec 201355.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba

MicroData Summary for Rafał Markowski
Bishop Rafał Markowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJózefów

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 155
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,988

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast