Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pinsk

Dioecesis Pinskensis Latinorum



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antoni Dziemianko, Bishop
  • Kazimierz Wielikosielec, O.P., Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 October 1925
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Belarus
  • Square Kilometers: 72,700 (28,080 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: ul. Lenina 16, 225710 Pinsk, Belarus
  • Telephone: (0165)32-31-57
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 October 1925ErectedDiocese of Minsk Diocese of Pinsk (erected)
28 March 1930Territory LostDiocese of Pinsk (Orchˇw) Diocese of Siedlce
11 January 1936Territory LostDiocese of Pinsk (Wodzld, Sciony, and Kiewlahi) Diocese of Łomża
13 April 1991Territory LostDiocese of Łomża (7 parishes)
Diocese of Pinsk (4 parishes)
Archdiocese of Vilnius (119 parishes)
Diocese of Grodno (erected) (Grodno)
13 April 1991Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Pinsk (from Vilnius)
13 April 1991Territory AddedDiocese of Pinsk (Brest and Oomel)
5 June 1991Territory LostDiocese of Pinsk Diocese of Drohiczyn (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950319,6031531532,08835133ap1951
197088,000174,00050.6%801811,08614935ap1971
199950,0003,100,0001.6%1320331,515132764ap2000
200050,0003,100,0001.6%1320331,515314360ap2001
200150,0003,100,0001.6%1419331,515315260ap2002
200250,0003,100,0001.6%1723401,250355360ap2003
200350,0003,100,0001.6%1723401,250374360ap2004
200450,0003,100,0001.6%1924431,162414760ap2005
201350,0003,110,0001.6%292352961314676ap2014
201642,1003,108,0001.4%311950842245181ap2017
201952,0002,800,0001.9%3217491,061244285ap2020
202150,8252,780,0001.8%361652977263687ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 521, to Page 528
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 83, Page 542, and Page 543

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024