Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wladyslaw Jedruszuk

Deceased

Bishop of Drohiczyn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1918BornLipno
3 Jan 194324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Siedlce, Poland
19 Nov 196244.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus
19 Nov 196244.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Clysma
23 Jun 196344.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clysma
16 Feb 196748.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pinsk, Belarus
5 Jun 199172.5AppointedBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland
25 May 199475.5DiedBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wladyslaw Jedruszuk:
Bishop Wladyslaw Jedruszuk (born , died ) Bishop of Drohiczyn

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013