Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoni Pawlowski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1903BornKonskie
26 Sep 192623.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 195047.2AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
27 Dec 195249.9Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 Sep 196865.6DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Pawlowski:
Archbishop Antoni Pawlowski (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013